Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE57086T | 15.10.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3620900 | 21.06.1986 | EP87108563 | 13.06.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3765335D1 | 08.11.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3620900 | 21.06.1986 | DE3765335 | 13.06.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0254023 | Global Dossier | 03.10.1990 | B1 | EP0254023 | 27.01.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3620900 | 21.06.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8703083 | 08.03.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3620900 | 21.06.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3620900 | 10.08.1989 | C2 | DE3620900 | 23.12.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3620900 | 21.06.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS633832 | 08.01.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3620900 | 21.06.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4735228 | 05.04.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3620900 | 21.06.1986 |