blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0251015

EP0251015 - Modular support structure for prefabricated sanitary installations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.1992
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.08.1992 [1992/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rutsch, Hubert
10, bis Route de Saint-Julien
CH-1227 Carouge / CH
[1988/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1988/01]
Representative(s)Meylan, Robert Maurice, et al
c/o Bugnion SA Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375
1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1988/01]Meylan, Robert Maurice, et al
c/o Bugnion SA Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375
CH-1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH
Application number, filing date87108601.315.06.1987
[1988/01]
Priority number, dateCH1986000261527.06.1986         Original published format: CH 261586
[1988/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0251015
Date:07.01.1988
Language:FR
[1988/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0251015
Date:01.03.1989
Language:FR
[1989/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0251015
Date:21.08.1991
Language:FR
[1991/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.1989
ClassificationIPC:E03C1/01
[1988/01]
CPC:
E03D11/146 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR [1988/01]
TitleGerman:Modulunterstützungskonstruktion für vorgefertigte Sanitärinstallationen[1988/01]
English:Modular support structure for prefabricated sanitary installations[1988/01]
French:Structure porteuse modulaire pour installations sanitaires préfabriquées[1988/01]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure19.06.1989Examination requested  [1989/33]
06.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.02.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.1991Fee for grant paid
29.04.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.05.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3211454  (BAILEY ARTHUR E);
 [Y]FR2355962  (EMPEREUR FRERES SA [FR]);
 [Y]DE2937624  (DOMOZELL SANITAERZELLEN GMBH);
 [A]DE3415585  (OHMES NORBERT)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.