EP0251129 - Process and device for pulling cables, particularly glass fibre cables, into a pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.11.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabelverlegetechnik Otto GmbH Wiesenstrasse 16 D-2722 Visselhövede / DE | [1988/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otto, Dieter Am Bramberg 17 D-2061 Seth / DE | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1988/13] |
Former [1988/01] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Postfach 30 24 30 D-20308 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108965.2 | 23.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | DE19863621617 | 27.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3621617 | [1988/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0251129 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/08, G02B6/44 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/52 (EP);
G02B6/4485 (EP);
H02G1/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einziehen von Kabel, insbesondere von Glasfaserkabel in ein Rohr | [1988/01] | English: | Process and device for pulling cables, particularly glass fibre cables, into a pipe | [1988/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de tirage de câbles, en particulier de câbles en fibres de verre dans un tuyau | [1988/01] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 10.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [1989/02] | 21.10.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |