EP0251138 - Process and corresponding machine for the production by continuous rolling of a mass of dough for bakery products and buns and rolls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SERMONT, S.A. Sepulveda, 140 bis Barcelona / ES | For all designated states CONSTRUCCIONES MECANICAS AGMI, S.A. Vitoria, 19-21 Mataro Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states SERMONT, S.A. Sepulveda, 140 bis Barcelona / ES | ||
For all designated states CONSTRUCCIONES MECANICAS AGMI, S.A. Vitoria, 19-21 Mataro Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ma Vinas i Nogueroles, José Av. Jaume Recoder, 10 Mataro, Barcelona / ES | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/01] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108982.7 | 23.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | ES19860556955 | 25.06.1986 Original published format: ES 556955 | [1988/01] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0251138 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251138 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A21C3/02 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
A21C3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Backwaren, Brötchen und Semmeln durch kontinuierliches Ausrollen einer Teigmasse | [1988/01] | English: | Process and corresponding machine for the production by continuous rolling of a mass of dough for bakery products and buns and rolls | [1988/01] | French: | Procédé et machine pour la production par laminage en continu d'une masse de pâte pour les produits de boulangerie et les petits pains | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 23.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0140458 (BRINKERS MARGARINEFAB [NL]); | [X]EP0056499 (BRINKERS MARGARINEFAB [NL]); | [A]FR2122214 (HAYASHI TORAHIKO); | [A]US2728307 (RHODES HERBERT C); | [A]US1949105 (LAUTERBUR EDWARD J, et al); | [A]FR2261707 (HAYASHI TORAHIKO [JP]) |