EP0251145 - Heavy-duty pneumatic radial tire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105 / JP | ||
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Tatsuo 1009, Isshiki, Hayama-machi Miura-gun Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108996.7 | 23.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | JP19860146020 | 24.06.1986 Original published format: JP 14602086 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0251145 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0251145 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251145 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60C15/06 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
B60C15/06 (EP);
B60C9/02 (KR);
B60C15/0607 (EP);
B60C9/00 (KR);
B60C2015/0625 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, LU [1988/01] | Title | German: | Gürtelreifen für Lastkraftwagen | [1988/01] | English: | Heavy-duty pneumatic radial tire | [1988/01] | French: | Bandage pneumatique radial pour poids lourds | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 13.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58112808 ; | [Y]DE2611482 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD); | [Y]US4513123 (DAY GARY L [US], et al); | [A]EP0148782 ; | [A]FR2385546 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4289184 (MOTOMURA KENICHI, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 217 (M-245)[1362], 27th September 1983; & JP-A-58 112 808 (YOKOHAMA GOMU K.K.) 05-07-1983, & JP58112808 A 00000000 |