blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0251195

EP0251195 - Method and reagent for the determination of alpha-amylase [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.12.1993
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.01.1994 [1994/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH
D-68298 Mannheim / DE
[1989/11]
Former [1988/01]For all designated states
BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH
Sandhofer Strasse 112-132
D-6800 Mannheim-Waldhof / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gerber, Martin, Dr. rer. nat.
Ignaz-Manz-Strasse 1
D - 8120 Weilheim-Unterhausen / DE
[1988/01]
Representative(s)Huber, Bernhard, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/01]Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
D-81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date87109113.824.06.1987
[1988/01]
Priority number, dateDE1986362127125.06.1986         Original published format: DE 3621271
[1988/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0251195
Date:07.01.1988
Language:DE
[1988/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0251195
Date:05.12.1990
Language:DE
[1990/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0251195
Date:03.02.1993
Language:DE
[1993/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.1990
ClassificationIPC:C12Q1/40, C12P21/00, C12N5/00, C12N15/00, G01N33/573
[1988/01]
CPC:
C07K16/40 (EP,US); C12Q1/40 (EP,US); C12Q2334/10 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US); Y10S435/81 (EP,US); Y10S435/975 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Reagenz zur Bestimmung von alpha-Amylase[1988/01]
English:Method and reagent for the determination of alpha-amylase[1988/01]
French:Procédé et réactif de détermination de l'alpha-amylase[1988/01]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure24.06.1987Examination requested  [1988/01]
23.10.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.07.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.1992Fee for grant paid
17.09.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.11.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1994/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
16.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
11.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4304854  (NIX PAUL T, et al);
 [Y]EP0135758  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]);
 [Y]EP0171960  (GENZYME CORP [US]);
 [XP]EP0191284  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]);
 [XP]EP0194600  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]);
 [XP]EP0209154  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.