EP0251233 - Anisotropic rare earth magnet material and production process thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Development Corporation of Japan 5-2, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states Research Development Corporation of Japan 5-2, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugawara, Eishu 4-10, Kitamaecho, Yamada Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | 02 /
Nakayama, Taketoshi 23-33, Kongosawa 1-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | 03 /
Masumoto, Tsuyoshi 8-22, Kamisugi 3-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Sandmair, Kurt, et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Sandmair, Kurt, Dr. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Postfach 86 02 45 D-81629 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109193.0 | 26.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | JP19860148159 | 26.06.1986 Original published format: JP 14815986 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0251233 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251233 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/07, C22C30/00, C22C1/10, H01F41/18, H01F1/04, C23C14/34 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
C23C14/3414 (EP,US);
H01F1/055 (EP,US);
H01F1/057 (EP,US);
H01F41/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/01] | Title | German: | Anisotroper magnetischer Werkstoff aus seltenen Erden und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben | [1988/01] | English: | Anisotropic rare earth magnet material and production process thereof | [1988/01] | French: | Matériau magnétique anisotrope à base de terres rares et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/32] | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2142110 ; | [A]EP0144851 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0146323 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0148504 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0151861 (GRUMMAN AEROSPACE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0167118 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP], et al) |