EP0255603 - High pressure sintering furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/06] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boneff, Stoyan, Dr. Lisztstrasse 16 D-8580 Bayreuth / DE | [1988/06] | Application number, filing date | 87109239.1 | 26.06.1987 | [1988/06] | Priority number, date | DE19863625788 | 30.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3625788 | [1988/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0255603 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0255603 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F27B5/04, F27B5/08, // B22F3/14 | [1988/06] | CPC: |
B30B11/002 (EP,US);
B22F3/15 (EP,US);
F27B5/04 (EP,US);
F27B5/08 (EP,US);
F27D9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/06] | Title | German: | Hochdrucksinterofen | [1988/06] | English: | High pressure sintering furnace | [1988/06] | French: | Four de frittage sous pression élevée | [1988/06] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 26.06.1987 | Examination requested [1988/06] | 23.11.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/04] | 30.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE494608 ; | [X]US3419935 (PFEILER WILLIAM A, et al); | [A]DE2016657 ; | [A]US3900189 (ELMGREN STAFFAN, et al); | [Y]EP0133808 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]); | [E]GB2192260 (PFEIFFER VAKUUMTECHNIK) |