EP0251289 - Gas turbine power plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BMW Rolls-Royce GmbH Hohemarkstrasse 60-70 61440 Oberursel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states BMW ROLLS-ROYCE GmbH Hohemarkstrasse 60-70 D-61440 Oberursel / DE | ||
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states BMW Rolls-Royce GmbH Hohemarkstrasse 60 - 70 W-6370 Oberursel / DE | ||
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states KHD Luftfahrttechnik GmbH Hohemarkstrasse 60 - 70 D-6370 Oberursel / DE | ||
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brockmann, Heinz Holzweg 25 D-6380 Bad Homburg 6 / DE | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Bücken, Helmut Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-50 80788 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Bücken, Helmut Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-30 D-80788 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109380.3 | 30.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | DE19863622022 | 01.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3622022 | [1988/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0251289 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0251289 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251289 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/32 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
F02C7/36 (EP,US);
F02C7/32 (EP,US);
F05D2260/4023 (EP,US);
Y10S74/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/01] | Title | German: | Gasturbinentriebwerk | [1988/01] | English: | Gas turbine power plant | [1988/01] | French: | Propulseur à turbine à gaz | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 12.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1124823 ; | [AD]GB703262 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [Y]GB973388 (GEORGE GARNHAM TURNER); | [A]US3626692 (KUMM EMERSON L); | [Y]CH520266 (KRONOGARD SVEN OLOF [SE], et al); | [A]DE3143389 (ROLAND FAHRZEUGPLANUNG UND VER [DE]) |