blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0251322

EP0251322 - Method for refining non-oxide ceramic powders [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.07.1992
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.1992Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.08.1992 [1992/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON KOKAN KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1988/01]For all designated states
NIPPON KOKAN KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nishio, Hiroaki c/o Patent &Licence and
Quality Standards Dpt. Nippon Kokan K.K.
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
02 / Sato, Michitaka c/o Patent & Licence and
Quality Standards Dpt. Nippon Kokan K.K.
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
[1989/36]
Former [1988/01]01 / Nishio, Hiroaki Patent & Licence and
Quality Standards Dpt. Nippon Kokan K.K.
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
02 / Sato, Michitaka Patent & Licence and
Quality Standards Dpt. Nippon Kokan K.K.
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Hansen, Bernd, et al
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/01]Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date87109546.902.07.1987
[1988/01]
Priority number, dateJP1986015416002.07.1986         Original published format: JP 15416086
[1988/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0251322
Date:07.01.1988
Language:EN
[1988/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0251322
Date:28.06.1989
Language:EN
[1989/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:C04B35/56, C04B35/58
[1988/01]
CPC:
C04B35/65 (EP,US); C01B21/062 (EP,US); C01B21/064 (EP,US);
C01B21/0687 (EP,US); C01B21/0728 (EP,US); C01B21/0768 (EP,US);
C01B32/90 (EP,US); C01B32/921 (EP,US); C01B32/956 (EP,US);
C01B35/04 (EP,US); C04B35/5611 (EP,US); C04B35/563 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US); C04B35/58007 (EP,US); C04B35/58014 (EP,US);
C04B35/58071 (EP,US); C04B35/58078 (EP,US); C04B35/583 (EP,US);
C04B35/584 (EP,US); C01P2006/60 (EP,US); C01P2006/80 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1988/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Raffinierung von nicht-oxidischen Keramikpulvern[1988/01]
English:Method for refining non-oxide ceramic powders[1988/01]
French:Procédé de purification de poudres céramiques sans oxyde[1988/01]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure02.07.1987Examination requested  [1988/01]
07.02.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1992/35]
02.04.1992Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1992/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4485182  (ENOMOTO RYO [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.