EP0254100 - Apparatus for eliminating gas bubbles from liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baurmeister, Ulrich, Dr. Moltkestrasse 67 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 02 /
Pelger, Michael, Dr. Wilhelm-Dissmann-Strasse 5 D-5600 Wuppertal 22 / DE | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | Fett, Günter CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19 - 21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | Fett, Günter Akzo Patente GmbH, Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109568.3 | 03.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | DE19863624363 | 18.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3624363 | [1988/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254100 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254100 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0254100 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
A61M5/36 (EP,US);
B01D19/0031 (EP,US);
B01D63/025 (EP,US);
B01D63/026 (EP,US);
B01D63/04 (EP,US);
B01D2319/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/12] |
Former [1988/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Abtrennen von Gasblasen aus Flüssigkeiten | [1988/04] | English: | Apparatus for eliminating gas bubbles from liquids | [1988/04] | French: | Dispositif pour éliminer les bulles de gaz des fluides | [1988/04] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 31.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 12.06.1991 | Appeal received No. T0670/91 | 20.08.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.11.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1949038 (SKYLES ROBERT THOMAS, et al); | [AD]DE1959679 (BAXTER LABORATORIES INC); | [A]GB1301015 (PALL CORP [US]); | [AD]FR2183113 (PALL CORP [US]); | [AD]DE2737745 (AKZO GMBH); | [A]EP0014403 (PALL CORP [US]); | [Y]US4276170 (VAILLANCOURT VINCENT L); | [AD]GB2092153 (AKZO NV); | [AD]GB2134812 (AKZO NV); | [Y]EP0138060 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) |