EP0264546 - Projectile and its sabot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall GmbH Pempelfurtstrasse 1 40880 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states Rheinmetall GmbH Pempelfurtstrasse 1 D-40880 Ratingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallow, Peter Bergische Landstrasse 615 D-4000 Düsseldorf 12 / DE | 02 /
Bethmann, Karl Wilhelm Gellertstrasse 15 D-4130 Moers / DE | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Podszus, Burghart Rheinmetall GmbH Ulmenstrasse 125 Postfach 6609 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Podszus, Burghart, Dipl.-Phys. Rheinmetall GmbH Ulmenstrasse 125 Postfach 6609 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109633.5 | 04.07.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | DE19863635738 | 21.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3635738 | [1988/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0264546 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0264546 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F42B13/16, F42B13/06, F42B13/02 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
F42B14/064 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/17] | F42B13/16, F42B13/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/17] | Title | German: | Treibkäfig-Fluggeschoss-Anordnung | [1988/17] | English: | Projectile and its sabot | [1988/17] | French: | Ensemble d'un projectile et son sabot | [1988/17] | File destroyed: | 30.10.1997 | Examination procedure | 12.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/10] | 10.10.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.08.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4638739 (SAYLES DAVID C [US]); | [Y]FR2599828 (SAUVESTRE JEAN CLAUDE [FR]); | [Y]US2788744 (OTTO DONNER HANS); | [Y]US2715874 (HABLUTZEL CHARLES E, et al); | [A]FR592192 (BATIGNOLLES SA CONST DES); | [A]US4015535 (BOND JR JOHN W); | [A]EP0152492 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) |