Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3772927D1 | 17.10.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3772927 | 20.10.1987 | DE3635738 | 21.10.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0265369 | Global Dossier | 11.09.1991 | B1 | EP0265369 | 25.01.1989 | A3 | EP0265369 | 27.04.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3635738 | 21.10.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0264546 | Global Dossier | 11.01.1989 | A3 | EP0264546 | 27.04.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3635738 | 21.10.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3635738 | 16.08.1990 | C2 | DE3635738 | 19.05.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3635738 | 21.10.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4850280 | 25.07.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3635738 | 21.10.1986 |