EP0267365 - Signature handling apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/20] | Signature handling apparatus and method | ||
[1991/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AM INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED 333 West Wacker Drive Suite 900 Chicago Illinois 60606-1265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | For all designated states AM INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED 333 West Wacker Drive Suite 900 Chicago Illinois 60606-1265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlough, James R. R.D.No. 2 Box 254-A Morrisonville New York 12962 / US | [1988/20] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 8052 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1988/20] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. c/o Rottmann + Quehl AG Glattalstrasse 37 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 87109669.9 | 06.07.1987 | [1988/20] | Priority number, date | US19860928896 | 10.11.1986 Original published format: US 928896 | [1988/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0267365 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0267365 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/42, B65H39/043 | [1988/20] | CPC: |
B65H3/10 (EP);
B65H3/42 (EP);
B65H2301/42322 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1988/20] | Title | German: | Apparat zum Handhaben von Druckprodukten | [1991/19] | English: | Signature handling apparatus | [1991/19] | French: | Appareil pour manipuler des imprimés | [1991/19] |
Former [1988/20] | Apparat und Verfahren zum Handhaben von Druckprodukten | ||
Former [1988/20] | Signature handling apparatus and method | ||
Former [1988/20] | Appareil et procédé pour manipuler des imprimés | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.07.1987 | Examination requested [1988/20] | 30.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2631599 [ ]; | US2903260 [ ]; | EP0095603 [ ] |