blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0253275

EP0253275 - Quaternary ammonium compounds and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.01.1992
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.02.1992 [1992/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/03]For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lange, Fritz, Dr.
Baderweg 82
D-4300 Essen / DE
02 / Rutzen, Horst, Dr.
Falkenweg 12
D-4018 Langenfeld / DE
03 / Busch, Peter, Dr.
Gottfried-August-Bürger-Strasse 10
D-4006 Erkrath / DE
04 / Thiele, Klaus
Rügenweg 5
D-4018 Langenfeld / DE
[1988/03]
Application number, filing date87109763.007.07.1987
[1988/03]
Priority number, dateDE1986362373014.07.1986         Original published format: DE 3623730
[1988/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0253275
Date:20.01.1988
Language:DE
[1988/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0253275
Date:06.03.1991
Language:DE
[1991/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.1987
ClassificationIPC:C07C213/00, C07C215/06, C07C217/04, A61K7/075
[1991/10]
CPC:
A61Q5/12 (EP); A61K8/45 (EP)
Former IPC [1988/03]C07C93/04, C07C91/06, C07C89/02, A61K7/075
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1990/38]
Former [1988/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Neue quartäre Ammoniumverbindungen und deren Verwendung[1988/03]
English:Quaternary ammonium compounds and their use[1988/03]
French:Composés d'ammonium quaternaires et leur application[1988/03]
Examination procedure08.07.1988Examination requested  [1988/36]
29.03.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.08.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.1990Fee for grant paid
02.11.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.12.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchGB1087413  [ ] (MARCHON PRODUCTS LTD);
 DE3116087  [ ] (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al);
 DE3345156  [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 DE3442175  [ ] (HENKEL KGAA [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.