EP0258574 - Filter device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Postfach 77 77 77 31132 Hildesheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | For all designated states Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Postfach 77 77 77 D-31132 Hildesheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogelsang, Ulrich, Dr. Ing. Asterweg 10b D-3200 Hildesheim / DE | [1988/10] | Representative(s) | Eilers, Norbert Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 77 77 77 31132 Hildesheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | Eilers, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys. Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 77 77 77 D-31132 Hildesheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109778.8 | 07.07.1987 | [1988/10] | Priority number, date | DE19863627679 | 14.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3627679 | [1988/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0258574 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0258574 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03H17/02 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
H03H17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/10] | Title | German: | Filteranordnung | [1988/10] | English: | Filter device | [1988/10] | French: | Dispositif de filtrage | [1988/10] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/30] | 23.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.01.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4137510 [ ]; | DE2839229 [ ] | [ ] - INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, 30. August - 2. September 1978, Seiten 683-687, Universita di Firenze, FlorenceIT; T.A. RAMSTAD: "Branch filtering using FIR and IIR complementary structures" | [ ] - TELECOMMUNICATIONS & RADIO ENGINEERING, Band 37-38, Nr. 7, Juli 1983, Seiten 49-52, Scripta Publishing Co., Silver Spring, MDUS; A.I. GRECHIKHIN: "A filter-divider and a filter-adder with linear phase characteristics" |