EP0253290 - Spherical toner particle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shirasaki, Yoshitsugu 1450, Nishihama Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | 02 /
Torimoto, Yoshiaki 204, Nishino, Iwadecho Naga-gun Wakayama / JP | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 D-81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109853.9 | 08.07.1987 | [1988/03] | Priority number, date | JP19860165304 | 14.07.1986 Original published format: JP 16530486 | [1988/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0253290 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0253290 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0253290 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0253290 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/08 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
G03G9/0806 (EP,US);
G03G9/0819 (EP,US);
G03G9/0904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/03] | Title | German: | Kugelförmige Tonerteilchen | [1988/03] | English: | Spherical toner particle | [1988/03] | French: | Particules de toner sphériques | [1988/03] | Examination procedure | 08.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/41] | 11.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1993
01.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Canon Inc. No. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP Opponent's representative Bühling, Gerhard Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1993
01.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Canon Inc. No. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP Opponent's representative Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | 06.10.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.04.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.07.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.07.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.08.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.08.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.02.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59101655 ; | [A]JP58007648 ; | [A]DE2727890 (XEROX CORP) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 219 (P-306)[1656], 5th October 1984; & JP-A-59 101 655 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K.K.) 12-06-1984, & JP59101655 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 78 (P-188)[1223], 31st March 1983; & JP-A-58 007 648 (CANON K.K.) 17-01-1983, & JP58007648 A 00000000 |