EP0253304 - Resistive tape element, processes for its preparation and its uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tapeswitch 100 Schmitt Boulevard Farmingdale New York 11735 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | For all designated states Tapeswitch 100 Schmitt Boulevard Farmingdale New York 11735 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lovell, Walter C. 348 Mountain Road Wilbraham Massachusetts 01095 / US | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 D-90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109895.0 | 09.07.1987 | [1988/03] | Priority number, date | US19860884220 | 10.07.1986 Original published format: US 884220 | [1988/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0253304 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0253304 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0253304 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01C17/06, H01C17/02, H01C7/00, H01C10/10, H01C17/22, H01C17/24, H01C7/02, H01B7/10 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
H01C7/00 (EP,US);
H01C10/106 (EP,US);
H01C17/02 (EP,US);
H01C17/07 (EP,US);
H01C17/22 (EP,US);
H01C17/24 (EP,US);
H01H3/142 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1988/03] | H01C17/02, H01C7/02, H01C10/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/03] | Title | German: | Resistives Bandelement, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Verwendungen | [1988/03] | English: | Resistive tape element, processes for its preparation and its uses | [1988/03] | French: | Elément en bande résistive, ses procédés de fabrication et applications | [1988/03] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 18.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2077508 (WEATHERLEY RICHARD); | [Y]FR2357040 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2023452 (PREH ELEKTROFEINMEC); | [A]GB1363603 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [AD]GB2065430 (JUNKOSHA CO LTD); | [A]DE2346206 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]CH425927 (RESOURCES AND FACILITIES CORP [CH]) |