EP0252508 - Water soluble disazo colorant and dyeing method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hihara, Toshio 2-71-503, Aoyama 1-chome Yahatanishi-ku Kita-kyushu-shi Fukuoka / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Yukiharu 5-312-11, Sainokami 1-chome Yahatanishi-ku Kita-kyushu-shi Fukuoka / JP | 03 /
Shimizu, Kanzi 6-315-35, Sainokami 1-chome Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukoaka / JP | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109932.1 | 09.07.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | JP19860162557 | 09.07.1986 Original published format: JP 16255786 | JP19860162556 | 09.07.1986 Original published format: JP 16255686 | JP19870021804 | 03.02.1987 Original published format: JP 2180487 | JP19870021805 | 03.02.1987 Original published format: JP 2180587 | [1988/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0252508 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0252508 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252508 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/09, C09B62/513, D06P1/38 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
C09B62/09 (EP,US);
C09B62/513 (EP,US);
D06P1/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1988/02] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche Disazofarbstoffe und Verfahren zum Färben mit diesen Farbstoffen | [1988/02] | English: | Water soluble disazo colorant and dyeing method using the same | [1988/02] | French: | Colorants disazoiques solubles dans l'eau et procédé de teinture les utilisant | [1988/02] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 16.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1461125 (ICI LTD); | [X]GB1454210 (ICI LTD); | [A]FR2413443 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]GB2159829 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) |