EP0257277 - Method for simultaneously forming a interconnection level and via studs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1992 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chalou, Paul Normand Jr. 68 Balfour Drive Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 02 /
Houghton, Thomas Frederick 24 Birch Drive Beacon, NY 12508 / US | 03 /
West, Richard Keith 11 Westview Terrace Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Moncheny, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | Moncheny, Michel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1988/09] | Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 87110152.3 | 14.07.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | US19860901492 | 28.08.1986 Original published format: US 901492 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0257277 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0257277 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, H01L21/263, H01L21/203, H01L21/90, C23C14/34 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
H01L21/76877 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/25] | H01L21/00, H01L21/263, H01L21/203, C23C14/34 | ||
Former IPC [1988/09] | H01L21/00, H01L21/263 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur simultanen Herstellung von einer Verbindungsebene und von Durchgangsstifte | [1988/09] | English: | Method for simultaneously forming a interconnection level and via studs | [1988/09] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication simultanée d'un niveau d'interconnection et de pointes traversantes | [1988/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 29.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/37] | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4107726 (SCHILLING HARTMUT); | [Y]US4111775 (HOLLIS JR BEN R, et al); | [Y]US4523372 (BALDA RAYMOND J [US], et al); | [XP]WO8703013 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) | [X] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2nd INTERNATIONAL IEEE VLSI MULTILEVEL INTERCONNECTION CONFERENCE | [X] - THIN SOLID FILMS | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3rd INTERNATIONAL IEEE VLSI MULTILEVEL INTERCONNECTION CONFERENCE | [A] - SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY |