EP0254188 - Tilt sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-6, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/15] |
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo-to 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odagawa, Yoshimoto 3-17-9, Isobe Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Yanagisawa, Yasushi 1-13-13, Kotehashidai Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Imaizumi, Hiraku 2-16-16, Chuodai Shisuimachi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87110176.2 | 14.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | JP19860169930 | 21.07.1986 Original published format: JP 16993086 | [1988/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254188 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254188 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0254188 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01C9/10, G01C9/06 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
G01C9/10 (EP,US);
G01C9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/04] | Title | German: | Neigungssensor | [1988/04] | English: | Tilt sensor | [1988/04] | French: | Senseur d'inclinaison | [1988/04] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 23.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 11.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60100712 ; | [A]JP60133370 ; | [A]JP5866812 ; | [X]GB2158239 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [A]DE2430710 (HONEYWELL GMBH) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 250 (C-394)[1973], 8th October 1985; & JP-A-60 100 712 (KIDOU KENSETSU KOGYO K.K.) 04-06-1985, & JP60100712 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 296 (P-407)[2019], 22nd November 1985; & JP-A-60 133 370 (DIESEL KIKI K.K.) 16-07-1985, & JP60133370 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 156 (P-209)[1301], 8th July 1983; & JP-A-58 66 812 (NIPPON KOKAN K.K.) 21-04-1983, & JP5866812 A 00000000 |