EP0254992 - Alternating current power loss detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERSIL, INC. (a Delaware corp.) 2450 Walsh Avenue Santa Clara California 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states INTERSIL, INC. (a Delaware corp.) 2450 Walsh Avenue Santa Clara California 95051 / US | ||
Former [1988/05] | For all designated states INTERSIL INC. 10600 Ridgeview Court Cupertino California 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mostyn, Graham Yorke 10600 Ridgeview Court Cupertino, Ca. 95014 / US | 02 /
Yunus, Mohammad 10600 Ridgeview Court Cupertino, Ca. 95014 / US | [1988/05] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1988/05] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald GE/RCA Patent Operation Burdett House, 4th Floor 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87110354.5 | 17.07.1987 | [1988/05] | Priority number, date | US19860892702 | 01.08.1986 Original published format: US 892702 | [1988/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254992 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254992 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/24 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
H02H3/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/05] | Title | German: | Detektor für den Ausfall der Wechselstromleistung | [1988/05] | English: | Alternating current power loss detector | [1988/05] | French: | Détecteur pour la perte de puissance à courant alternatif | [1988/05] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 24.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/26] | 26.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55026471 ; | [Y]US3725795 (MESENHIMER L); | [Y]US4071822 (KAMIYA MASAAKI); | [A]US3611162 (TOCHITANI YUTAKA) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 55 (P-8)(538) 24th April 1980; & JP-A-55 026 471 (MATSUSHITA) 25-02-1980, & JP55026471 A 00000000 |