EP0257291 - Circuit arrangement for the wiring of high power transformers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stein, Werner, Dr. Strassenäckerweg 4 D-8500 Nürnberg 60 / DE | 02 /
Müller, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Kappelbergsteig 37 D-8540 Schwabach / DE | [1988/09] | Application number, filing date | 87110408.9 | 17.07.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | DE19863625845 | 30.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3625845 | [1988/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0257291 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0257291 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01F29/02, H01F27/34 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
H01F29/02 (EP);
H01F27/343 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/09] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung für Leistungsgrosstransformatoren | [1988/09] | English: | Circuit arrangement for the wiring of high power transformers | [1988/09] | French: | Dispositif de connexions pour transformateurs de grande puissance | [1988/09] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/20] | 17.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1658664 (BRAND FREDERICK F); | [Y]US1809895 (GAY FRAZER W); | [A]CH275245 (CESKOSLOVENSKE Z TEZKEHO STROJ [CZ], et al); | [A]FR2007394 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]FR2103536 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]US3668511 (LEWIS CHARLES E); | [A]DE2117422 (SCHORCH GMBH) | Examination | EP0141296 |