EP0300066 - Device for automatically filling drinking receptacles with beer or a similar beverage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1992 [1992/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kronemeyer, Jan Hindrik Hoher Kamp 4 D-4459 Uelsen / DE | [1989/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Postfach 12 26 D-49002 Osnabrück / DE | ||
Former [1989/04] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Postfach 1226 D-49002 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 87110430.3 | 18.07.1987 | [1989/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0300066 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300066 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/12, B67D1/06 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
B67D1/1238 (EP);
B67D1/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, FR, NL [1989/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum selbsttätigen Befüllen von Trinkgefässen mit Bier u. dgl. Getränken | [1989/04] | English: | Device for automatically filling drinking receptacles with beer or a similar beverage | [1989/04] | French: | Dispositif pour le remplissage automatique de récipients avec de la bière ou des boissons analogues | [1989/04] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 27.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1294260 ; | [Y]DE2309438 (NIEDERMAIER JOSEF); | [X]DE2534554 (BECKER GUMMIWERKE); | [X]DE2921663 (KRUSE ERNST OTTO); | [A]US4446896 (CAMPAGNA GERALD L [US]); | [A]US4458735 (HOUMAN LEIF [US]); | [Y]US4572253 (FARMER M ZANE [US], et al) |