EP0254242 - Windscreen wiper arrangement, especially for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWF Auto-Electric GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 119 Postfach 135 D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states SWF Auto-Electric GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 119 Postfach 135 D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egner-Walter, Bruno Käferflugstrasse 43 D-7100 Heilbronn / DE | 02 /
Schmid, Eckhardt Heilbronner Strasse 62 D-7129 Brackenheim / DE | 03 /
Scholl, Wolfgang Forststrasse 29 D-7121 Gemmrigheim / DE | [1988/04] | Application number, filing date | 87110436.0 | 18.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | DE19863624715 | 22.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3624715 | [1988/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0254242 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0254242 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/36 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
B60S1/365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/04] | Title | German: | Scheibenwischeranlage, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1988/04] | English: | Windscreen wiper arrangement, especially for motor vehicles | [1988/04] | French: | Arrangement d'essuie-glace, specialement pour véhicules à moteur | [1988/04] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 18.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.10.1990 | ES | 04.02.1991 | [2004/03] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 24.10.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3447438 (ZIKELI FRIEDRICH); | [Y]FR2548605 (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER [DE]); | [Y]US4418440 (SIGETY JR STEPHEN [US]); | [A]EP0075521 (FLAMME SPRL [BE], et al) |