EP0256328 - Tool shop, especially for milling and drilling machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHO Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1280 Tiroler Strasse 85 D-87459 Pfronten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states MAHO Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1280 Tiroler Strasse 85 D-87459 Pfronten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Babel, Werner Achweg 19 D-8962 Pfronten-Meilingen / DE | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/08] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87110486.5 | 20.07.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | DE19863627515 | 13.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3627515 | [1988/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0256328 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256328 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q3/157 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
B23Q13/00 (EP,US);
B23Q3/15536 (EP,US);
Y10T483/11 (EP,US);
Y10T483/1752 (EP,US);
Y10T483/1864 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/08] | Title | German: | Werkzeugmagazin für insbesondere Fräs- und Bohrmaschinen | [1988/08] | English: | Tool shop, especially for milling and drilling machines | [1988/08] | French: | Magasin d'outils en particulier pour les machines à fraiser et à forer | [1988/08] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/17] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0072865 [ ] (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD [JP]); | FR2529127 [ ] (DANA CORP [US]); | FR2547230 [ ] (MOULIN GEORGES [FR]) | Examination | US4196506 |