EP0254280 - Method for processing silver halide color photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohki, Nobutaka Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Seto, Nobuo Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Naruse, Hideaki Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Andoh, Kazuto Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Ishikawa, Takatoshi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Fujimoto, Hiroshi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 07 /
Yagihara, Morio Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/04] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87110566.4 | 21.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | JP19860170756 | 22.07.1986 Original published format: JP 17075686 | JP19870124038 | 22.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12403887 | [1988/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254280 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254280 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0254280 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/392, // C07C243/10 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
G03C7/413 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/04] | G03C7/30, // C07C109/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung eines farbphotographischen Silberhalogenidmaterials | [1988/04] | English: | Method for processing silver halide color photographic material | [1988/04] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'un matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent | [1988/04] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 07.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.12.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/03] | FR | 20.05.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3141771 (BARD CHARLETON C, et al); | [Y]FR2148902 (KODAK PATHE); | [Y]EP0151305 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) | Examination | FR1087759 |