EP0256338 - Method and apparatus for reheating and ready-to-serve cooking of foodstuffs, especially baked and grilled goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAPORINA BACK- UND GEFRIERGERÄTE GMBH Im Länderrain 10 D-7146 Tamm / DE | [1988/44] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states Kirchhoff, Ernst Buchfinkenweg 1 D-31515 Wunstorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirchhoff, Ernst Buchfinkenweg 1 D-3050 Wunstorf 1 / DE | [1992/11] |
Former [1988/08] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann,K. Fincke,F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber,H. Liska,J. Prechtel,B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/08] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87110567.2 | 21.07.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | DE19863627332 | 12.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3627332 | DE19873700532 | 09.01.1987 Original published format: DE 3700532 | DE19873701366 | 19.01.1987 Original published format: DE 3701366 | [1988/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0256338 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0256338 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256338 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A21B5/00 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
A21B5/00 (EP,US);
A21B3/04 (EP,US);
A47J27/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Wiedererwärmen und Fertigbacken von Lebensmitteln, insbesondere von Back- und Grillgut | [1988/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for reheating and ready-to-serve cooking of foodstuffs, especially baked and grilled goods | [1988/08] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour réchauffer et cuire des produits alimentaires, en particulier les produits cuits au four ou grillés | [1988/08] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 16.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 11.03.1992 | LU | 31.07.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | LU | 31.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1142650 (ELECTROLUX AB); | [A]US3814901 (MORHACK G); | [A]USRE28292E ; | [Y]US4039776 (RODERICK RONALD R); | [A]FR2492223 (ALUMINIUMARUGYAR [HU]); | [X]US4452132 (MILLER DYE O [US], et al); | [E]EP0251947 (JOVANOVIC DRAGOMIR) |