EP0255901 - Flame retardant brightly coloured reinforced polyamide moulding compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/07] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plachetta, Christoph, Dr. Albert-Einstein-Allee 12 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
Reimann, Horst, Dr. Adelheidstrasse 26 D-6520 Worms 1 / DE | 03 /
Steinberger, Rolf, Dr. Am Moenchhof 47 D-6707 Schifferstadt / DE | 04 /
Theysohn, Rainer, Dr. Am Bruch 38 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 05 /
Weiss, Hans-Peter, Dr. Pfalzring 75 D-6704 Mutterstadt / DE | [1988/07] | Application number, filing date | 87110740.5 | 24.07.1987 | [1988/07] | Priority number, date | DE19863626768 | 07.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3626768 | [1988/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0255901 | Date: | 17.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0255901 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255901 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/03] |
Former [1988/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP0255901 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[1988/20] | |||
[1989/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08K13/04, C08L77/00, // (C08K13/04, 3:02, 3:22, 7:04),(C08L77/00, 21:00) | [1988/07] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP);
C08K13/04 (EP);
C08K3/02 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K13/04, C08L77/00 (EP);
C08K3/02, C08L77/00 (EP);
C08K3/22, C08L77/00 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/07] | Title | German: | Flammgeschützte verstärkte Polyamidformmassen mit heller Einfärbung | [1988/07] | English: | Flame retardant brightly coloured reinforced polyamide moulding compositions | [1988/07] | French: | Matières à mouler à base de polyamide, renforcées, retardatrices de flamme et ayant une coloration claire | [1988/07] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 10.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0125483 (BASF AG [DE]); | [AD]DE1931387 (BASF AG) |