EP0255073 - Circuit device and resonance tag and method of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Actron Entwicklungs AG Lettenstrasse 8 CH-6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [1989/26] |
Former [1988/05] | For all designated states DURGO AG Kapellplatz 2 CH-6000 Luzern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jorgensen, Paul Richter La Romantica 8 Urb. Los Pinos Almunecar / ES | [1988/05] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Joachim Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 8035 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Lauer, Joachim, Dr. Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 CH-8035 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1988/05] | Büchel, Kurt F., Dr. Patentbüro Büchel & Partner AG Letzanaweg 25-27 FL-9495 Triesen / LI | Application number, filing date | 87110808.0 | 25.07.1987 | [1988/05] | Priority number, date | CH19860003103 | 30.07.1986 Original published format: CH 310386 | [1988/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0255073 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255073 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/01, H05K1/16 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
G08B13/2437 (EP,US);
H05K3/00 (KR);
H01L27/01 (EP,US);
H05K1/165 (EP,US);
H05K1/162 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09672 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0571 (EP,US);
H05K3/061 (EP,US);
H05K3/4084 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/05] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung und Resonanzetikette sowie Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1988/05] | English: | Circuit device and resonance tag and method of making the same | [1988/05] | French: | Dispositif à circuit et étiquette de résonance et son procédé de fabrication | [1988/05] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 04.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.12.1993 | IT | 01.12.1993 | NL | 01.12.1993 | SE | 01.12.1993 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 01.12.1993 | |
IT | 01.12.1993 | ||
NL | 01.12.1993 | ||
SE | 01.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | BE | 01.12.1993 | |
NL | 01.12.1993 | ||
SE | 01.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/43] | NL | 01.12.1993 | |
SE | 01.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 01.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8200541 (VANDEBULT J); | [A]WO8301697 (REEB MAX E); | [A]US3921167 (FOX JON EDWARD); | [A]FR2577067 (COUPIN PATRICE [FR], et al) |