EP0262325 - Device for a distribution frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELENORMA GMBH Kleyerstrasse 94 60326 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states TELENORMA GMBH Kleyerstrasse 94 D-60326 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states TELENORMA Telefonbau und Normalzeit GmbH Mainzer Landstrasse 128-146 D-60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krämer, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Im Hain 5 D-6271 Idstein-Heftrich / DE | 02 /
Barkow, Helmut Im Wingertsgrund 80 D-6374 Steinbach / DE | [1988/14] | Application number, filing date | 87110834.6 | 25.07.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | DE19863629551 | 30.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3629551 | [1988/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0262325 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0262325 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0262325 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/14 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
H04Q1/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/14] | Title | German: | Anordnung für Hauptverteiler | [1988/14] | English: | Device for a distribution frame | [1988/14] | French: | Dispositif pour distributeur | [1988/14] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 06.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2110538 (HOBSON LTD H M); | [AD]DE3335193 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | Examination | DE2110528 |