EP0257339 - Medical micro pipette tips for difficult to reach places and related methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MULTI-TECHNOLOGY, INC. 6500 South 400 West Salt Lake City Utah 84107 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states MULTI-TECHNOLOGY, INC. 6500 South 400 West Salt Lake City Utah 84107 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeffs, David H. 6500 South 400 West Salt lake City Utah 84107 / US | 02 /
Jessop, Paul M. 6500 South 400 West Salt lake City Utah 84107 / US | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | Meddle, Alan Leonard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87111049.0 | 30.07.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | US19860895104 | 11.08.1986 Original published format: US 895104 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0257339 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0257339 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0257339 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
B01L3/0275 (EP,US);
B01L3/02 (KR);
Y10T436/2575 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/09] | Title | German: | Spitzen für medizinische Mikropipetten für schwer zugängliche Stellen und damit verbundene Verfahren | [1988/09] | English: | Medical micro pipette tips for difficult to reach places and related methods | [1988/09] | French: | Embouts pour micro-pipettes médicales pour endroits difficiles d'accès et procédés liés | [1988/09] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 22.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.09.1987 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   08.10.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0126390 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]US3337095 (MARBACH JACOB P, et al); | [A]GB1317708 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS LTD); | [A]EP0182943 (ATAKE MINORU); | [A]FR2315320 (OXFORD LAB [US]); | [A]US3141336 (OATES WILLIAM M) |