EP0257346 - Proportional automatic gain control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pearce, Harold Brent 5922 Jacob Glen Austin Texas 78727 / US | 02 /
West, Lynn Parker 10201 Pantera Ridge Austin Texas 78759 / US | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Burt, Roger James, Dr., et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1990/09] | Johansson, Lars E. IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 4-01 S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1988/09] | Ahlman, Bertel IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 87111112.6 | 31.07.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | US19860901904 | 29.08.1986 Original published format: US 901904 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0257346 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0257346 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0257346 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/20, H03G7/00 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
H03G3/3089 (EP,US);
H03G7/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/09] | Title | German: | Proportionelle automatische Pegelkontrolle | [1988/09] | English: | Proportional automatic gain control | [1988/09] | French: | Contrôle de gain automatique du type proportionnel | [1988/09] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3983381 (JONES JR GARDNER D); | [A]US3969683 (FABRICIUS WAYNE NIXON); | [A]US3562504 (HARRIS RALPH A); | [AD]US4191995 (FARROW CECIL W [US]); | [A]EP0117662 (HAZELTINE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0218870 (IBM [US]) |