EP0257364 - Developing method for electrostatic latent image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaneko, Tadashi Konishiroku Photo Ind. Co., Ltd. 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Okuyama, Yuki Konishiroku Photo Ind. Co., Ltd. 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Arai, Mitsutaka Konishiroku Photo Ind. Co., Ltd. 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Yoko Konishiroku Photo Ind. Co., Ltd. 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Ikeuchi, Satoru Konishiroku Photo Ind. Co., Ltd. 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 87111197.7 | 03.08.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | JP19860183422 | 06.08.1986 Original published format: JP 18342286 | JP19860183423 | 06.08.1986 Original published format: JP 18342386 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0257364 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0257364 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0257364 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03G13/08, G03G9/10, G03G15/00 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
G03G13/09 (EP);
G03G9/1134 (EP);
G03G9/1136 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/09] | Title | German: | Entwicklungsverfahren für latente elektrostatische Bilder | [1988/09] | English: | Developing method for electrostatic latent image | [1988/09] | French: | Procédé pour développer des images latentes électrostatiques | [1988/09] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 12.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.07.1993
01.09.1993
ADMISSIBLE Canon Inc. No. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP Opponent's representative Bühling, Gerhard Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.07.1993
01.09.1993
ADMISSIBLE Canon Inc. No. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP Opponent's representative Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | 07.09.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.03.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.06.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.11.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.08.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 08.09.1995 | Appeal received | 10.11.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.12.1995 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.10.1992 | [2004/35] | Documents cited: | Search | EP0161128 [ ]; | DE3511171 [ ]; | EP0188171 [ ]; | DE3004152 [ ] |