EP0256450 - Process for manufacturing powder compacts with a high resistance and relatively low density from a heat-resisting aluminium alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1991 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1988/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Couper, Malcolm James, Dr. Mittelgasse 8 CH-5301 Station Siggenthal / CH | [1988/08] | Application number, filing date | 87111463.3 | 07.08.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | CH19860003230 | 12.08.1986 Original published format: CH 323086 | [1988/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0256450 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256450 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/04, B22F9/08 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
B22F9/082 (EP,US);
C22C1/0416 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1988/08] | Title | German: | Pulvermetallurgisches Verfahren zur Herstellung eines grünen Presskörpers hoher Festigkeit und niedriger relativer Dichte aus einer warmfesten Aluminiumlegierung | [1988/08] | English: | Process for manufacturing powder compacts with a high resistance and relatively low density from a heat-resisting aluminium alloy | [1988/08] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'ébauches compactées à résistance élevée et densité relativement faible à partir d'un alliage d'aluminium résistant à la chaleur | [1988/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 14.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.01.1991 | CH | 31.08.1991 | LI | 31.08.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [1992/33] | FR | 21.06.1991 | |
CH | 31.08.1991 | ||
LI | 31.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/02] | FR | 21.06.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1758844 (SACHIJEW ALEKSANDR S, et al); | [X]US3954458 (ROBERTS SIDNEY G) |