EP0257489 - Method for generating a sound wave by utilizing electron rays etc., and optical device for controlling a light by an elastic wave generated by said method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Kenji 404, Lions-Mansion, 1176-1 Tsurumaki Hadano-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kan, Fumitaka 28-25, Haginaka 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hayakawa, Naoji A-404, Highness-Aobadai 25-9 Sakuradai Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Takenouchi, Masanori A-202, Corp-Irisawa 4-8, Tamura-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Shimoda, Isamu 93-1, Tatsunodai Zama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Okunuki, Masahiko 182-8, Takao Itsukaichi-cho Tama-gun Tokyo / JP | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/09] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif-Winter-Roth Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87111828.7 | 14.08.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | JP19860191854 | 15.08.1986 Original published format: JP 19185486 | JP19860191860 | 15.08.1986 Original published format: JP 19186086 | JP19860191861 | 15.08.1986 Original published format: JP 19186186 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0257489 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/33, G10K15/00, H01J37/30, G02B6/12 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
G02B6/12004 (EP);
G02F1/335 (EP);
G10K15/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erzeugen von Schallwellen mittels Elektrodenstrahlen etc. und optische Vorrichtung zum Steuern von Licht mittels einer durch das Verfahren erzeugten elastischen Welle | [1988/09] | English: | Method for generating a sound wave by utilizing electron rays etc., and optical device for controlling a light by an elastic wave generated by said method | [1988/09] | French: | Procédé pour engendrer des ondes sonores par faisceaux électroniques etc. et dispositif optique de contrôle de la lumière utilisant une onde élastique engendrée par ce procédé | [1988/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 16.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/30] | 07.03.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2732855 ; | [X]US3532181 ; | [Y]US4259678 ; | [A]US4348075 | [A] - L. LEVI "Applied Optics, A Guide to Optical System Design", vol. 2, 1980 JOHN WILEY & SONS, New York pages 275-282, chapters 14.2.4.1, 14.2.4.2, 14.2.4.3 | [A] - H.J. EICHLER et al. "Laser-induced Dynamic Gratings", Springer Series in Optical Sciences, vol. 50, 1986 SPRINGER-VERLAG, Berlin, Heidelberg, pages 140-143, chapter 5.3 |