EP0260463 - Dosing pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grünbeck Wasseraufbereitung GmbH Industriestrasse 1 D-89420 Höchstädt / DE | [1988/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kern, Hans Wimpasing D-8221 Vachendorf / DE | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H. Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. Harthauser Strasse 25d D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87111971.5 | 18.08.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | DE19863631982 | 19.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3631982 | [1988/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0260463 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/02, F04B23/06 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
F04B23/06 (EP,US);
F04B43/0027 (EP,US);
F04B43/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/12] | Title | German: | Dosierpumpe | [1988/12] | English: | Dosing pump | [1988/12] | French: | Pompe de dosage | [1988/12] | File destroyed: | 25.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 29.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 17.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/15] | 08.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | NL93648C [ ]; | DE7733135U [ ]; | US4278406 [ ] (COOPERRIDER MYRON T) |