EP0256558 - Method and apparatus of manufacturing water proof optical cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuma, Masumi c/o Yokohama Works Sumito Electric Industries Ltd. No. 1, Taya-cho Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Mizuno, Akira No. 2-1, Aza Higashiura Kitayama-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi / JP | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/08] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87111999.6 | 18.08.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | JP19860193798 | 19.08.1986 Original published format: JP 19379886 | [1988/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0256558 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44, H01B13/32 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
G02B6/4408 (EP);
G02B6/44384 (EP);
G02B6/4479 (EP);
G02B6/4483 (EP);
G02B6/4491 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines wasserundurchlässigen Kabels | [1988/08] | English: | Method and apparatus of manufacturing water proof optical cable | [1988/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil de fabrication d'un câble étanche à l'eau | [1988/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/11] | 27.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AU21965B [ ]; | US4011991 [ ] (MASUDA SENICHI); | DE2712820 [ ] (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD); | US4100002 [ ] (WOYTIUK LEO VICTOR, et al); | DE2240007 [ ]; | DE1577944 [ ]; | DE3127961 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | US4401366 [ ] (HOPE TOMASZ S [CA]); | EP0174424 [ ] (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) |