EP0258754 - Turbine blade with a cooling insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/10] | Hollow metallic element with an insert, especially a turbine blade with a cooling insert | ||
[1991/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.1991 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.01.1992 [1992/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU MOTOREN- UND TURBINEN-UNION MÜNCHEN GMBH Postfach 50 06 40 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | For all designated states MTU MOTOREN- UND TURBINEN-UNION MÜNCHEN GMBH Postfach 50 06 40 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maisch, Helmut Kochelseestrasse 7 D-8038 Gröbenzell / DE | 02 /
Fedrau, Dieter Birkenstrasse 39 D-8011 Zorneding / DE | [1988/10] | Application number, filing date | 87112126.5 | 21.08.1987 | [1988/10] | Priority number, date | DE19863629910 | 03.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3629910 | [1988/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0258754 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0258754 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0258754 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D5/14 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
B23P11/025 (EP,US);
C22F1/006 (EP,US);
F01D5/189 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/10] | Title | German: | Turbinenschaufel mit Kühleinsatz | [1991/06] | English: | Turbine blade with a cooling insert | [1991/06] | French: | Aube de turbine avec noyau de refroidissement | [1991/06] |
Former [1988/10] | Metallischen Hohlbauteil mit einem metallischen Einsatz, insbesondere Turbinenschaufel mit Kühleinsatz | ||
Former [1988/10] | Hollow metallic element with an insert, especially a turbine blade with a cooling insert | ||
Former [1988/10] | Elément métallique creux avec un noyau, en particulier aube de turbine avec noyau de refroidissement | Examination procedure | 01.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 06.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3900939 (GREACEN JOHN STUART); | [YD]DE1476790 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [Y]GB625693 (BRUSH ELECTRICAL ENG, et al) | [A] - MATERIALS ENGINEERING, Oktober 1969, Seiten 28-31; H.J. WAGNER et al.: "What you can do with that 'memory' alloy" |