EP0260492 - Automatic printing plate-tightening device for sheet-fed printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1992 [1992/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirata, Yasuhiko c/o Mihara Machinery Works Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 5007, Itozaki-cho Mihara-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87112340.2 | 25.08.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | JP19860141428U | 17.09.1986 Original published format: JP 14142886 U | [1988/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0260492 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0260492 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0260492 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
B41F27/1231 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/12] | Title | German: | Automatische Druckplatten-Spannvorrichtung für Bogendruckmaschine | [1988/12] | English: | Automatic printing plate-tightening device for sheet-fed printing machine | [1988/12] | French: | Dispositif automatique de tension de plaque d'impression pour machine d'impression alimentée en feuilles | [1988/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1987 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 06.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58140254 ; | [A]JP60061265 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 257 (M-256)(1402) 16 November 1983, & JP-A-58 140254 (TOUKIYOU KIKAI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 19 August 1983,, & JP58140254 A 19830819 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 198 (M-404)(1921) 15 August 1985, & JP-A-60 061265 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) 09 April 1985,, & JP60061265 A 19850409 |