EP0279017 - Process fo copolymerization of bicyclic amide acetals and polyisocyanates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASHLAND OIL, INC. 1000 Ashland Drive Russell Kentucky 41169 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states Ashland Oil, Inc. 1000 Ashland Drive Russell Kentucky 41169 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goel, Anil B. 373 Eastworth Court Worthington Ohio 43085 / US | [1988/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87112476.4 | 27.08.1987 | [1988/34] | Priority number, date | US19870004738 | 20.01.1987 Original published format: US 4738 | [1988/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0279017 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0279017 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/38, C08G18/00, C08G18/22 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
C08G18/3827 (EP,US);
C08G18/00 (EP,US);
C08G18/22 (EP,US);
C08G2120/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Copolymerisation von bicyclischen Amidazetalen mit Polyisocyanaten | [1988/34] | English: | Process fo copolymerization of bicyclic amide acetals and polyisocyanates | [1988/34] | French: | Procédé de copolymérisation d'acétals d'amide bicycliques et de polyisocyanates | [1988/34] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1987 | Examination requested [1988/34] | 26.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/01] | 11.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4549005 [ ] (GOEL ANIL B [US]); | US4584362 [ ] (LECKART ARTHUR R [US], et al); | US3245958 [ ] (HINDERSINN RAYMOND R, et al); | DE3235933 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | US4663302 [ ] (GOEL ANIL B [US]); | FR1294010 [ ] (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) |