EP0261474 - Cable plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zell, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Moritz-von-Schwind-Weg 80 D-8134 Niederpöcking / DE | 02 /
Seidel, Peter Mittenwalderstrasse 256 D-8038 Gröbenzell / DE | 03 /
Pelzl, Leo Alpenblickstrasse 5 D-8150 Holzkirchen / DE | [1988/13] | Application number, filing date | 87112884.9 | 03.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | DE19863632600 | 25.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3632600 | [1988/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261474 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261474 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261474 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/658 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
H01R13/6592 (EP,US);
H01R13/6594 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/13] | Title | German: | Kabelstecker | [1988/13] | English: | Cable plug | [1988/13] | French: | Fiche pour câble | [1988/13] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2445049 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]WO8505230 (AMP INC [US]) |