Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] |
03.10.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.11.1992 [1992/47] |
29.11.1991 | First examination report | |
11.04.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] |
17.08.1988 | Publication of search report | published on 05.10.1988 [1988/40] |
13.02.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.03.1988 [1988/13] |