Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE82650T | 15.12.1992 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP87112884 | 03.09.1987 | DE3632600 | 25.09.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3782706D1 | 24.12.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3782706 | 03.09.1987 | DE3632600 | 25.09.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0261474 | Global Dossier | 19.11.1992 | B1 | EP0261474 | 05.10.1988 | A3 | EP0261474 | 30.03.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3632600 | 25.09.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4789358 | 06.12.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3632600 | 25.09.1986 |