EP0260560 - Process for the preparation of 2-chlor-5-chlormethyl thiazole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1988/12] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-5090 Leverkusen 1 Bayerwerk / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Gunther, Dr. Am Mittelberg 19 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Heitzer, Helmut, Dr. Hoehenstrasse 84 D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | [1988/12] | Application number, filing date | 87113029.0 | 07.09.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | DE19863631538 | 17.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3631538 | [1988/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0260560 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0260560 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/32 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
C07D277/32 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-Chlor-5-chlormethylthiazol | [1988/12] | English: | Process for the preparation of 2-chlor-5-chlormethyl thiazole | [1988/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation de chloro-2-chlorométhyl-5-thiazol | [1988/12] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1987 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 05.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0192060 (NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO KK [JP]) |