EP0259823 - Trap for mice and rats [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.09.1991 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1991 | Refusal of application | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jäger, Heinz Johowstrasse 22 D-4390 Gladbeck / DE | [1988/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/11] | Representative(s) | Spalthoff, Adolf Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 45074 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | Spalthoff, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 D-45074 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113075.3 | 08.09.1987 | [1988/11] | Priority number, date | DE19863630576 | 09.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3630576 | [1988/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0259823 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0259823 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01M23/18 | [1988/11] | CPC: |
A01M23/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, NL [1988/11] | Title | German: | Falle für Mäuse und Ratten | [1988/11] | English: | Trap for mice and rats | [1988/11] | French: | Piège pour souris et rats | [1988/11] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 05.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 06.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1991/43] | 07.06.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3688432 ; | [A]FR932190 ; | [A]DE476426 |