EP0259845 - Protection against inverted polarity and AC for DC-operated electrical loads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1992 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Obergfell, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. Langbehnstrasse 11a D-8000 München 21 / DE | [1988/11] | Application number, filing date | 87113136.3 | 08.09.1987 | [1988/11] | Priority number, date | DE19863630990 | 11.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3630990 | [1988/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0259845 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0259845 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0259845 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H02H11/00 | [1988/11] | CPC: |
H02H11/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/11] | Title | German: | Verpolungs- und Wechselspannungsschutz für gleichstrombetriebene elektrische Verbraucher | [1988/11] | English: | Protection against inverted polarity and AC for DC-operated electrical loads | [1988/11] | French: | Protection contre l'inversion de polarité et contre les tensions alternatives pour les consommateurs électriques à courant continu | [1988/11] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 29.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 31.07.1991 | SE | 31.07.1991 | ES | 11.11.1991 | [2004/03] |
Former [1992/12] | NL | 31.07.1991 | |
SE | 31.07.1991 | ||
Former [1992/10] | SE | 31.07.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2242050 (EISEMANN GMBH); | [AD]DE2743622 (SIEMENS AG); | [AD]DE2743636 (SIEMENS AG) |