EP0262475 - Printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states MAN Technologie Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 04 26 D-80974 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states MAN Technologie GmbH Dachauer Strasse 667 Postfach 50 04 26 D-8000 München 50 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirt, Alfred, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Sörgelstrasse 13 D-8000 München 71 / DE | 02 /
Fuhrmann, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. Rathausstrasse 38 D-8047 Karlsfeld / DE | [1988/14] | Application number, filing date | 87113140.5 | 09.09.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | DE19863633758 | 03.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3633758 | [1988/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0262475 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0262475 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0262475 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10, B41N1/14 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
B41C1/1058 (EP,US);
B41N1/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1988/14] | Title | German: | Druckmaschine | [1988/14] | English: | Printing machine | [1988/14] | French: | Machine pour l'impression | [1988/14] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 23, no. 2, 15 Juli 1973, NEW YORK US Seiten 57 - 59; C.E.Land et al.: "Reflective-mode ferroelectric-photoconductor image storage and display devices" |