EP0261518 - Brake for the locking of tensioning elements provided on ski boots [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/13] | Brake, particularly for the locking of tensioning elements provided in ski boots | ||
[1991/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A. Via Montebelluna 5/7 31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A. Via Montebelluna 5/7 I-31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | ||
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A Via Montebelluna 5/7 I-31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pozzobon, Alessandro Via Ruga 15 I-31050 Paderno di Ponzano Veneto Trevis / IT | 02 /
Gorza, Roberto Via C. Rizzarda 15 I-32032 Feltre Belluno / IT | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 87113300.5 | 11.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | IT19860059440U | 23.09.1986 Original published format: IT 5944086 U | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261518 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261518 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261518 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/18, A43B5/04 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
A43C11/16 (EP,US);
A43C11/165 (EP);
Y10S242/913 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [1988/13] | Title | German: | Bremse zum Sperren von Spannelementen an Skischuhen | [1991/21] | English: | Brake for the locking of tensioning elements provided on ski boots | [1991/21] | French: | Frein pour bloquer des éléments de serrage de chaussures de ski | [1991/21] |
Former [1988/13] | Bremse, insbesondere zum Sperren von Spannelementen an Skischuhen | ||
Former [1988/13] | Brake, particularly for the locking of tensioning elements provided in ski boots | ||
Former [1988/13] | Frein, notamment pour bloquer des éléments de serrage de chaussures de ski | Examination procedure | 05.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 13.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0056953 (NORDICA SPA [IT]); | [AP]EP0201051 (NORDICA SPA [IT]); | [AP]EP0204945 (NORDICA SPA [IT]) |