EP0261560 - Titania sol and process for producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.07.1995 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.1995 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. No. 3-22, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. No. 3-22, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Masashi 550-3, Nishitomidacho Yokkaichi-shi / JP | 02 /
Okuda, Haruo 816-188, Hagicho Yokkaichi-shi / JP | 03 /
Koike, Setuo 5-33, Nagoasahimachi-1-chome Suzuka-shi / JP | 04 /
Yamasaki, Yasuo 2-3, Mie-9-chome Yokkaichi-shi / JP | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113489.6 | 15.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | JP19860224409 | 22.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22440986 | JP19860268829 | 12.11.1986 Original published format: JP 26882986 | JP19870033889 | 17.02.1987 Original published format: JP 3388987 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261560 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261560 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261560 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C01G23/00, A61K7/00 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
A61K8/29 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G23/047 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/13] | C01G23/053, A61K7/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/08] |
Former [1988/13] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Titandioxydsol und Verfahren zur seiner Herstellung | [1988/13] | English: | Titania sol and process for producing same | [1988/13] | French: | Sol de dioxyde de titane et procédé pour l'obtenir | [1988/13] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 31.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1992
15.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1992
15.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | 04.02.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.08.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.08.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 06.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.04.1995 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4612138 (KEISER BRUCE A [US]); | [A]FR2194651 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK [GB]); | [A]US3098044 (GLOVER EVERETT D) |